CHANDLER et al v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: ALEX CHANDLER and SELEDIA SERINA
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv06241
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: William J Martini
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw Jennifer L. Bloom as counsel for Defendant Samsung Electronoics America, Inc. Attorney JENNIFER LYNN BLOOM terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/21/2022. (sm)
December 20, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Motion to Withdraw Jennifer L. Bloom as Counsel of Record for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICH, ROBERT)
December 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. RICH on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (RICH, ROBERT)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by ALEX CHANDLER, SELEDIA SERINA. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. identifying Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (BLOOM, JENNIFER)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/18/2022. (jd, )
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint and Order by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.. (BLOOM, JENNIFER)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER LYNN BLOOM on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (BLOOM, JENNIFER)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE B. DERENZE on behalf of ALEX CHANDLER, SELEDIA SERINA (DERENZE, CATHERINE)
October 24, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13779029) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALEX CHANDLER, SELEDIA SERINA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHANDLER et al v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX CHANDLER
Represented By: CATHERINE B. DERENZE
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELEDIA SERINA
Represented By: CATHERINE B. DERENZE
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN BLOOM
Represented By: ROBERT A. RICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?