DAVIS v. WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: EVELYN DAVIS
Defendant: WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC, LEWIS CHESTER ASSOCIATES, INC., JOHN DOES 1-10 and XYZ CORP 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv06392
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/18/2023. (dam)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 5/2/23 at 11:30am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/18/23. (tjg, )
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 1/18/2023. (tjg, )
January 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Order Pretrial Scheduling Order by LEWIS CHESTER ASSOCIATES, INC., WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC. (HAMMOND, JOSHUA)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed counsel's letter dated 1/11/23. (ECF No. 11). The telephonic initial conference set for 1/18/23 will proceed as scheduled. The Court will discuss Defendants' request during that conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/11/23. (tjd)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Ivan R. Novich to Judge Waldor requesting adjournment of initial conference. (NOVICH, IVAN)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. WHITE on behalf of EVELYN DAVIS (WHITE, THOMAS)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by LEWIS CHESTER ASSOCIATES, INC., WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaintg with Prejudice under FRCP 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joshua B. Hammond In Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(HAMMOND, JOSHUA)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA BROOKS HAMMOND on behalf of LEWIS CHESTER ASSOCIATES, INC., WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC (HAMMOND, JOSHUA)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by EVELYN DAVIS re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaintg with Prejudice under FRCP 12(B)(6) (RYAN, THOMAS)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 1/18/23 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/5/22. (tjg, )
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaintg with Prejudice under FRCP 12(B)(6) by LEWIS CHESTER ASSOCIATES, INC., WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Tomasz Pacholec, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(NOVICH, IVAN)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaintg with Prejudice under FRCP 12(B)(6). Motion set for 12/19/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by IVAN R. NOVICH on behalf of Lewis Chester Associates, Inc., WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC (NOVICH, IVAN)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint.. (PACHOLEC, TOMASZ)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TOMASZ PACHOLEC on behalf of Lewis Chester Associates, Inc., WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC (PACHOLEC, TOMASZ)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC, Lewis Chester Associates, Inc. from Superior Court of Union County, case number UNN-L-002712-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13798780), filed by WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC, Lewis Chester Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through C to the Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(PACHOLEC, TOMASZ)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC, LEWIS CHESTER ASSOCIATES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/22/2022. (lag, )
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN DAVIS
Represented By: THOMAS N. RYAN
Represented By: THOMAS J. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Represented By: TOMASZ PACHOLEC
Represented By: JOSHUA BROOKS HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS CHESTER ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Represented By: TOMASZ PACHOLEC
Represented By: JOSHUA BROOKS HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?