RODRIGUEZ et al v. BLAKELY et al
Plaintiff: CARLOS RODRIGUEZ and RUTH RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: STEVEN BLAKELY, CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP, JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED), ABC CO. 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED) and XYZ CORPORATIONS (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED)
Case Number: 2:2022cv06810
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CO. 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED), JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED), CARLOS RODRIGUEZ, RUTH RODRIGUEZ, XYZ CORPORATIONS (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED) by STEVEN BLAKELY, CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP.(DOBBS, MARYJANE)
December 1, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP, STEVEN BLAKELY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/19/2022. (mxw) Modified on 12/7/2022 (mxw, ).
November 29, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps)
November 29, 2022 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY JANE BORDENS on behalf of STEVEN BLAKELY, CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP (BORDENS, EMILY)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Contrans Flatbed Group GP, Inc. and Steven Blakely. Attorney CHRISTOPHER BRADLEY for CARLOS RODRIGUEZ,CHRISTOPHER BRADLEY for RUTH RODRIGUEZ added. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by STEVEN BLAKELY, CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP, STEVEN BLAKELY from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-3019-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13855692), filed by CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP, STEVEN BLAKELY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DOBBS, MARYJANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ et al v. BLAKELY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN BLAKELY
Represented By: EMILY JANE BORDENS
Represented By: MARYJANE MCNICHOLAS DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTRANS FLATBED GROUP
Represented By: EMILY JANE BORDENS
Represented By: MARYJANE MCNICHOLAS DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CO. 1-10 (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS (FICTITIOUSLY NAMED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?