SHAH v. JADDOU et al
Plaintiff: MANISHA ASIT SHAH
Defendant: DIRECTOR UR M JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, ALISSA L EMMEL, MERRICK GARLAND and PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Case Number: 2:2023cv01813
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by MARTIN FOJAS on 4/13/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Summons Returned Executed. For future reference, please refer to the CM/ECF Event "Summons Returned Executed as to USA," as that event will calculate the proper "Answer Due Date" for U.S. Government Defendant(s). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
April 17, 2023 Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date for Defendant PHILIP R. SELLINGER has been reset for 6/5/2023 per the #2 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. (dam)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MANISHA ASIT SHAH. PHILIP R. SELLINGER served on 4/6/2023, answer due 4/27/2023. (FOJAS, MARTIN)
April 4, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALISSA L EMMEL, MERRICK GARLAND, UR M JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, PHILIP R. SELLINGER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
March 30, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas. (ak, )
March 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALISSA L EMMEL, MERRICK GARLAND, UR M JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, PHILIP R. SELLINGER (Filing and Admin fee $402 receipt number BNJDC-14211895), filed by MANISHA ASIT SHAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of form I-829, #2 Exhibit B - I-829 receipt notices for Plaintiff and son and daughter, #3 Exhibit C - I-526 approval notice, #4 Exhibit D - Copies of green cards for Plaintiff and Plaintiff's son and daughter, #5 Exhibit E - I-829 ASC Biometrics notices, #6 Exhibit F - Copies of I-797C notices to Plaintiff and son, #7 Exhibit G - Copies of I-797 notices dated 12-6-21 and 12-8-21, #8 Exhibit H - Copies of I-797 notices dated 1-31-23, #9 Exhibit I - Copies of Plaintiff's I-131 re-entry permit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons to Emmel, #12 Summons to Garland, #13 Summons to Jaddou, #14 Summons to Mayorkas, #15 Summons to Sellinger)(FOJAS, MARTIN) Modified on 4/4/2023 (dam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAH v. JADDOU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANISHA ASIT SHAH
Represented By: MARTIN OLIVER CABRERA FOJAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR UR M JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISSA L EMMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?