PERDUE v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: LARRY PERDUE
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, ALAN H. SHAW, JAMES A. SQUIRES and MARK R. GEORGE
Case Number: 2:2023cv02634
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/22/2023. (jd, )
May 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by LARRY PERDUE (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
May 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN E. SCHOENFELD on behalf of MARK R. GEORGE, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, ALAN H. SHAW, JAMES A. SQUIRES (SCHOENFELD, ALAN)
May 17, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Kevin McNulty, U.S.D.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 16, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK R. GEORGE, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, ALAN H. SHAW, and JAMES A. SQUIRES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
May 16, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 -2 Civil Cover sheet filed by LAURENCE ROSEN on 5/15/2023 appears to be filed with an incorrect case number and Judge. PLEASE REVIEW THE Civil Cover Sheet and file it in the correct case if necessary. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
May 16, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff LARRY PERDUE MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
May 16, 2023 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)
May 15, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff LARRY PERDUE, MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. by LARRY PERDUE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, #3 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #4 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #5 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit 4 - Rosen Law Firm Resume, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LARRY PERDUE. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by LARRY PERDUE as to MARK R. GEORGE, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, ALAN H. SHAW, JAMES A. SQUIRES. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK R. GEORGE, NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, ALAN H. SHAW, JAMES A. SQUIRES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14317935) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LARRY PERDUE. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERDUE v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY PERDUE
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION
Represented By: ALAN E. SCHOENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN H. SHAW
Represented By: ALAN E. SCHOENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES A. SQUIRES
Represented By: ALAN E. SCHOENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK R. GEORGE
Represented By: ALAN E. SCHOENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?