CIS MANAGEMENT, INC. v. AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP et al
Plaintiff: CIS MANAGEMENT, INC.
Defendant: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP (AIG), COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY and AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP
Case Number: 2:2023cv02689
Filed: May 18, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint Discovery Plan by CIS MANAGEMENT, INC..(O'CONNELL, CHRISTOPHER)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 7/18/2023 at 2:30 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 6/13/2023. (smf)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dec Page)(CAHALL, ROBERT) Modified on 5/26/2023 (wh).
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by IGOR KONSTANKEVICH on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Correspondence)(KONSTANKEVICH, IGOR) Modified on 5/22/2023 (wh).
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendant AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP only, without prejudice and without costs against either party. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/22/2023. (wh)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by IGOR KONSTANKEVICH on behalf of AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP and COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY (KONSTANKEVICH, IGOR) Modified on 5/22/2023 (wh).
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP. (CAHALL, ROBERT)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 Notice of Removal filed by R. CAHALL on 5/18/2023 was submitted with Corporate Disclosure Statements as attachments. For future reference, when submitting a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, please file those under a separate docket entry using the event "Corporate Disclosure Statement". This is for informational purposes only and the Clerk's Office has refiled the Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statements under ECF Numbers #2 and #3 . (wh)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (wh)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. as Corporate Parent. (wh)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP identifying THE VANGUARD GROUP as Corporate Parent. (wh)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP (AIG) from Union County Superior Court, case number UNN-L-832-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14325961), filed by COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP (AIG). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement Disclosure Statement of AIG, #3 Statement Disclosure Statement of Commerce & Industry Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit A)(CAHALL, ROBERT) Modified on 5/19/2023 (wh).
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIS MANAGEMENT, INC. v. AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIS MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. O'CONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP (AIG)
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES CAHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMERCE & INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES CAHALL
Represented By: IGOR KONSTANKEVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP
Represented By: IGOR KONSTANKEVICH
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES CAHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?