CADUCEUS, INC. v. UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP
Plaintiff: CADUCEUS, INC. and CADUCEUS HEALTH
Defendant: UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP and WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP
Case Number: 2:2023cv03415
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER regarding privilege dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/21/2023. (LM)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Letter from R. Cooper re Ptf's request for ext re Mtn to Stay re #44 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(COOPER, RITU)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter from Robyn Lym, Esq. re: adjournment request re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan . (LYM, ROBYN)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter from Ritu Kaur Cooper re #40 Letter, #42 Letter. (COOPER, RITU)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano re #40 Letter. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Consent Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/14/2023. (lag, )
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano and Andrew B. Howk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibits 1-3 to Joint Submission)(SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Proposed Order Consent Confidentiality by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (COOPER, RITU)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID HONIG and ANDREW HOWK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: The Defendant has filed a Motion to Stay all deadlines in this case pending the resolution of its Motion to Transfer, and the Plaintiff has opposed this request in a letter. Given the asserted exigencies here, the Court notes its preliminary view: that the Motion to Stay be denied, except that the deadline for the Defendants responsive pleading be adjourned from August 14, 2023 until September 26, 2023. Should either party wish to be heard further on this matter, it should file a letter brief of no more than two single-spaced pages on or before 4:30pm on August 14, 2023. The Court does not anticipate that there will be, after August 14, further briefing on the Motion to Stay. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 8/10/2023. (jr)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David B. Honig to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COOPER, RITU)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew B. Howk to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COOPER, RITU)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #35 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/30/2023. (lag, )
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Second Amended Complaint.. (COOPER, RITU)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $150.00, receipt number NEW48797 as to ANDREW HOWK. (ps)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano re #29 Letter. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by CADUCEUS, INC.. UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Service of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)(LYM, ROBYN)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition to Petition for Rule to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffery Kohlitz)(COOPER, RITU)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $150.00, receipt number NEW48798 as to DAVID HONIG. (ps)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER regarding interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/4/2023. (lag, )
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 8/4/2023. (ECR/ATT) (LM, )
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter from Wayne Health re #26 MOTION to Stay . (COOPER, RITU)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter from Wayne Health. (COOPER, RITU)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Interrogatories, #2 Proposed Deposition Notice)(SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that Proposed Interrogatories [27-1] submitted by Rosaria Suriano on 8/4/2023 are not filed pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court. Please refer to Local Rule 26.1(c)(1). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only.(lag, )
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Stay , #25 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan . Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Stay by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(COOPER, RITU)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(COOPER, RITU)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Letter from Robyn Lym re removal of ECF 22 from docket re #22 Letter. (LYM, ROBYN)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano - Revised Joint Submission. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter from Rosaria A. Suriano - Joint Submission. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 8/3/2023. (LM, )
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter re #13 Proposed Pretrial Order,, #12 Proposed Pretrial Order,. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David B. Honig. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/2/2023. (lag, )
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Howk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/2/2023. (lag, )
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephonic conference before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre at 12:15 p.m. on this date, August 2, 2023. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 3872545. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/2/23. (LM, )
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #17 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Honig, #16 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Howk. Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telelphone Conference held on 8/2/2023. (LM, )
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Honig by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of D. Honig in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Declaration Declaration of R. Cooper in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of D. Honig, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Exhibit Consent Letter)(COOPER, RITU)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Howk by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of A. Howk in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Declaration Declaration of R. Cooper in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of A. Howk, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Appendix Consent Letter)(COOPER, RITU)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Defendant shall respond to motion on or before 8/8/2023. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 8/1/2023. (lag, )
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBYN KATERINA LYM on behalf of CADUCEUS, INC. (LYM, ROBYN)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Order to Show Cause by CADUCEUS, INC. re #12 Proposed Pretrial Order,. (Attachments: #1 Brief Unredacted, #2 Declaration of Grant Knaggs Unredacted, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit I)(SURIANO, ROSARIA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Proposed Order to Show Cause by CADUCEUS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Redacted Brief, #2 Certification of Rosaria Suriano with Exhibits, #3 Certification of Grant Knaggs with Exhibits, #4 Text of Proposed Order Writ of Attachment, #5 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Order to Seal, #6 Certificate of Service)(SURIANO, ROSARIA)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP, filed by CADUCEUS, INC..(SURIANO, ROSARIA)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/12/2023. (qa, )
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,, for Amended Complaint by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint)(COOPER, RITU)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application 6.1 submitted by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/14/2023. (lag, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (COOPER, RITU)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (COOPER, RITU)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CADUCEUS, INC. identifying Caduceus, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SURIANO, ROSARIA)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (mxw)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certification of LOCAL CIVIL RULE 11.2 on behalf of UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (COOPER, RITU)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (COOPER, RITU)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Coversheet (COOPER, RITU)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RITU KAUR COOPER on behalf of UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP (COOPER, RITU)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY LAW DIVISION: HUDSON COUNTY, case number HUD-L-001859-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14410032), filed by UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - June 1 Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit C - First Amended State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - June 23 Waiver of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Summary Report, Proof of Service, and Track Assignment)(COOPER, RITU)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CADUCEUS, INC. v. UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CADUCEUS, INC.
Represented By: ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Represented By: ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CADUCEUS HEALTH
Represented By: ROSARIA A. SURIANO
Represented By: ROBYN KATERINA LYM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP
Represented By: RITU KAUR COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY PHYSICIAN GROUP
Represented By: RITU KAUR COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?