DIXON et al v. URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ANDREA DIXON and RAUL ROSA
Defendant: THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS (DCA)
Cross Defendant: URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION and THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS
Cross Claimant: COUNTY OF ESSEX
Case Number: 2:2023cv06376
Filed: August 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as to New Jersey Department of Community Affairs. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/16/2023. (qa, )
October 13, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal New Jersey Department of Community Affairs by ANDREA DIXON, RAUL ROSA. (SMIT, CLARA)
October 5, 2023 Filing 11 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LINA D. O'KEEFE terminated. Attorney JARED JAMES MONACO for COUNTY OF ESSEX,JARED JAMES MONACO for COUNTY OF ESSEX added.. (O'KEEFE, LINA)
September 28, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim for Which Relief Can Be Granted. Motion set for 11/6/2023 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
September 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim for Which Relief Can Be Granted by THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS. Responses due by 10/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in support of motion to dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MARSHALL, ADAM)
September 27, 2023 Filing 9 Essex County's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION by COUNTY OF ESSEX.(O'KEEFE, LINA)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (ECF No. #7 ) is denied without prejudice because the applicant failed to: (1) provide the years of admission and addresses of the officials or offices maintaining the rolls of the members of all of the bars in which the applicant is a member in good standing or, in lieu thereof, certificates of good standing issued by those maintaining such rolls; (2) indicate whether opposing counsel's consent to admission was sought; (3) include a handwritten signature; and (4) state the correct jurat, see 28 U.S.C. 1746. Please consult Local Civil Rule 101.1(c) and paragraph 5 of the Court's # Civil Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/18/2023. (sms)
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bruce J. Gitlin, Esq. by ANDREA DIXON, RAUL ROSA. (Attachments: #1 Statement)(SMIT, CLARA)
September 13, 2023 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by ANDREA DIXON, RAUL ROSA. THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/13/2023. (SMIT, CLARA)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by ANDREA DIXON, RAUL ROSA. COUNTY OF ESSEX served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. (SMIT, CLARA)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to New Jersey Department of Community Affairs. Attorney ADAM WILLIAM MARSHALL for THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service - electronically filed)(MARSHALL, ADAM)
September 13, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/27/2023. (qa, )
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Essex County. Attorney LINA D. O'KEEFE for COUNTY OF ESSEX added. (O'KEEFE, LINA)
September 8, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by COUNTY OF ESSEX has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/27/2023. (qa, )
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COUNTY OF ESSEX, THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
August 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF ESSEX, THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS (DCA), URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14553428) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANDREA DIXON, RAUL ROSA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMIT, CLARA)
August 21, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXON et al v. URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA DIXON
Represented By: CLARA R. SMIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAUL ROSA
Represented By: CLARA R. SMIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS
Represented By: ADAM WILLIAM MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: COUNTY OF ESSEX
Represented By: JARED JAMES MONACO
Represented By: LINA D. O'KEEFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY AFFAIRS (DCA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?