ADAMS et al v. OLSHAN FROME WOLOSKY LLP
Petitioner: AMERISERV FINANCIAL, INC., J. MICHAEL ADAMS, AMY BRADLEY, ALLAN R. DENNISON, KIM W. KUNKLE, MARGARET A. O'MALLEY, DANIEL A. ONORATO, MARK E. PASQUERILLA, SARA A. SARGENT, JEFFREY A. STOPKO and J. MICHAEL ADAMS, JR.
Respondent: OLSHAN FROME WOLOSKY LLP
Intervenor: JULIUS D. RUDOLPH, DRIVER OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS I, L.P., IZZY and BRANDON L. SIMMONS
Case Number: 2:2023cv22619
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Evelyn Padin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER granting the withdrawal of Petitioners' pending #1 Motion to Compel, and that the Court dismiss this proceeding in its entirety. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/4/2024. (wh)
December 22, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #9 Letter of Withdrawal filed by C. MCDONALD on 12/21/2023 was submitted incorrectly using the event "Motion to Withdraw". As this submission was not in the form of a Motion, it should have been filed using either the event "Letter" or "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal". This is for informational purposes only. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (wh)
December 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 49 receipt number ANJDC-14892755.) by J. MICHAEL ADAMS, JR, AMERISERV FINANCIAL, INC., AMY BRADLEY, ALLAN R. DENNISON, KIM W. KUNKLE, MARGARET A. O'MALLEY, DANIEL A. ONORATO, MARK E. PASQUERILLA, SARA A. SARGENT, JEFFREY A. STOPKO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Dismissing Underlying Case)(MCDONALD, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J. MICHAEL ADAMS, JR, AMERISERV FINANCIAL, INC., AMY BRADLEY, ALLAN R. DENNISON, KIM W. KUNKLE, MARGARET A. O'MALLEY, DANIEL A. ONORATO, MARK E. PASQUERILLA, SARA A. SARGENT, JEFFREY A. STOPKO. (MCDONALD, CHRISTOPHER)
December 20, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Intervene. Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
December 20, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #4 CROSS-MOTION quashing Petitioners subpoena re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas. Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by Driver Opportunity Partners I, L.P., Julius D. Rudolph, Brandon L. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Intervene)(AYALA, THOMAS)
December 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS V. AYALA on behalf of Driver Opportunity Partners I, L.P., Julius D. Rudolph, Brandon L. Simmons (AYALA, THOMAS)
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by OLSHAN FROME WOLOSKY LLP re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 49 receipt number ANJDC-14892755.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAFFER, SCOTT) Modified on 12/20/2023 (wh).
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 CROSS-MOTION quashing Petitioners subpoena re #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas by OLSHAN FROME WOLOSKY LLP. (SHAFFER, SCOTT) Modified on 12/20/2023 (wh)
December 1, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Letter Rule 7.1 filed by SCOTT SHAFFER on 11/30/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference please use the event "Letter Rule 7.1" that can be found under CIVIL EVENTS - OTHER FILINGS - OTHER DOCUMENTS. The Clerks office has terminated the motion, reviewed the request and reset the motion according to Local Rule 7.1. This message is for informational purposes only.(wh)
December 1, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas. Motion reset for 1/2/2024 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 49 receipt number ANJDC-14892755.) by OLSHAN FROME WOLOSKY LLP. (SHAFFER, SCOTT)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Motion to Quash/Compel/Enforce,, CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERISERV FINANCIAL, INC.. (MCDONALD, CHRISTOPHER)
November 27, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas. Motion set for 12/18/2023 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (wh)
November 27, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a corporate disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (wh)
November 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (ak, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 49 receipt number ANJDC-14892755.), filed by MARGARET A. O'MALLEY, AMY BRADLEY, DANIEL A. ONORATO, SARA A. SARGENT, J. MICHAEL ADAMS, MARK E. PASQUERILLA, AMERISERV FINANCIAL, INC., ALLAN R. DENNISON, JEFFREY A. STOPKO, KIM W. KUNKLE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law i/s/o Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Jason P. Rudloff, Esq., #3 Exhibits A through I, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MCDONALD, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 11/27/2023 (wh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS et al v. OLSHAN FROME WOLOSKY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERISERV FINANCIAL, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J. MICHAEL ADAMS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMY BRADLEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALLAN R. DENNISON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIM W. KUNKLE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARGARET A. O'MALLEY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANIEL A. ONORATO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK E. PASQUERILLA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SARA A. SARGENT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEFFREY A. STOPKO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J. MICHAEL ADAMS, JR.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: OLSHAN FROME WOLOSKY LLP
Represented By: SCOTT SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JULIUS D. RUDOLPH
Represented By: THOMAS V. AYALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DRIVER OPPORTUNITY PARTNERS I, L.P.
Represented By: THOMAS V. AYALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: IZZY
Represented By: THOMAS V. AYALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BRANDON L. SIMMONS
Represented By: THOMAS V. AYALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?