HUSSAIN v. TD BANK N.A. et al
Plaintiff: NADYA HUSSAIN
Defendant: TD BANK N.A. and BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00524
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's request adjourning the pending motion to dismiss by one additional cycle, to 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 3/18/2024. (jd, )
March 18, 2024 Reset Deadlines as to #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion reset for 4/15/2024 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 17 Letter from Zachary D. Wellbrock, Esq. re #14 Letter Rule 7.1, #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (WELLBROCK, ZACHARY)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER re #15 Converting the Initial Conference into a Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2024 at 11:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/13/2024. (jd, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 15 Letter from Jennifer A. Harris, Esquire addressed to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #12 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags, #14 Letter Rule 7.1, #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
March 5, 2024 Reset Deadlines as to #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion reset for 4/1/2024 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by NADYA HUSSAIN re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with consent of movant (WELLBROCK, ZACHARY)
February 21, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 3/18/2024 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
February 20, 2024 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by TD BANK N.A.. Responses due by 3/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, JENNIFER)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/23/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/20/2024. (seb)
February 19, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
February 2, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 and #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by Defendants TD BANK N.A. and BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/20/2024. (jd, )
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES PATRICK CLANCY on behalf of TD BANK N.A. (CLANCY, JAMES)
January 31, 2024 Filing 9 Letter from Philip A. Goldstein re: BANA's Notice of Consent. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to TD Bank, N.A... (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
January 31, 2024 Filing 7 Diversity Disclosure Statement by TD BANK N.A.. (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
January 31, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD BANK N.A. identifying TD Bank US Holding Company as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, JENNIFER)
January 31, 2024 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 31, 2024 Filing 4 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 31, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 30, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jd, )
January 30, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jd, )
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TD BANK N.A. from Superior Court of NJ, Essex County - Law Division, case number ESX-L-8442-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15046336), filed by TD BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit B - TD Bank, N.A. Corporate Inforamtion, #3 Exhibit C - Bank of America, N.A. Corporate Information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(HARRIS, JENNIFER)
January 29, 2024 Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUSSAIN v. TD BANK N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADYA HUSSAIN
Represented By: ZACHARY D. WELLBROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD BANK N.A.
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN HARRIS
Represented By: JAMES PATRICK CLANCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?