MARTIS v. MICHERY et al
Plaintiff: MARIUS MARTIS
Defendant: DAVID MICHERY, MARY WINTER, MARK BETOR, KENT PUCKETT, OLEG FIRER, JON NAJARIAN, JOHN ROLAND, TODD RAARUP, ARGUS MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC, RBL CAPITAL GROUP LLC and MULLEN AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2024cv02908
Filed: March 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIUS MARTIS. ARGUS MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. (SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARGUS MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC, MARK BETOR, OLEG FIRER, DAVID MICHERY, MULLEN AUTOMOTIVE, INC., JON NAJARIAN, KENT PUCKETT, TODD RAARUP, RBL CAPITAL GROUP LLC, JOHN ROLAND, MARY WINTER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
March 15, 2024 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
March 14, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by MARIUS MARTIS as to ARGUS MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC, MARK BETOR, OLEG FIRER, DAVID MICHERY, MULLEN AUTOMOTIVE, INC., JON NAJARIAN, KENT PUCKETT, TODD RAARUP, RBL CAPITAL GROUP LLC, JOHN ROLAND, MARY WINTER. (SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)
March 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARGUS MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC, MARK BETOR, OLEG FIRER, DAVID MICHERY, MULLEN AUTOMOTIVE, INC., JON NAJARIAN, KENT PUCKETT, TODD RAARUP, RBL CAPITAL GROUP LLC, JOHN ROLAND, MARY WINTER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15177928) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARIUS MARTIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SQUITIERI, OLIMPIO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIS v. MICHERY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIUS MARTIS
Represented By: OLIMPIO LEE SQUITIERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID MICHERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY WINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BETOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENT PUCKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLEG FIRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON NAJARIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD RAARUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARGUS MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBL CAPITAL GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULLEN AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?