UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9483 IN THE NAME OF JAE CHOI ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9483 IN THE NAME OF JAE CHOI ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT, CONTENTS OF BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4685 IN THE NAME OF SMART LEARNING, INC., CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 0711 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, CONTENS OF TD BANK ACCOUNT ENDING IN 2483 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, CONTENTS OF TD BANK ACCOUNT ENDING IN 1237 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, CONTENTS OF BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 6030 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, CONTENTS OF BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 6043 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9900 IN THE NAME OF HUDSON ASSET HOLDING CORP, CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4413 IN THE NAME OF HUDSON ASSET HOLDING CORP, CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 0353 IN THE NAME OF VIRTUA EDUCATION, INC., CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4827 IN THE NAME OF VIRTUA EDUCATION, INC., CONTENTS OF TD AMERITRADE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 2857 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM and THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 125 13TH STREET, CRESSKILL, NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 2:2024cv05863
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 125 13TH STREET, CRESSKILL, NEW JERSEY served on 6/12/2024. (LASERNA, PETER)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Forfeiture (LASERNA, PETER)
May 7, 2024 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SARAH DEVLIN terminated. Attorney PETER A. LASERNA for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (LASERNA, PETER)
May 7, 2024 Filing 2 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem issued (dam)
May 6, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9483 IN THE NAME OF JAE CHOI ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT, BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4685 IN THE NAME OF SMART LEARNING, INC., JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 0711 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, TD BANK ACCOUNT ENDING IN 2483 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, TD BANK ACCOUNT ENDING IN 1237 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 6030 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 6043 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9900 IN THE NAME OF HUDSON ASSET HOLDING CORP, JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4413 IN THE NAME OF HUDSON ASSET HOLDING CORP, JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 0353 IN THE NAME OF VIRTUA EDUCATION, INC., JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4827 IN THE NAME OF VIRTUA EDUCATION, INC., TD AMERITRADE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 2857 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM, THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 125 13TH STREET, CRESSKILL, NEW JERSEY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant In Rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (DEVLIN, SARAH) Modified on 5/7/2024 (dam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9483 IN THE NAME OF JAE CHOI ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: SARAH DEVLIN
Represented By: PETER A. LASERNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9483 IN THE NAME OF JAE CHOI ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4685 IN THE NAME OF SMART LEARNING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 0711 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENS OF TD BANK ACCOUNT ENDING IN 2483 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF TD BANK ACCOUNT ENDING IN 1237 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 6030 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 6043 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 9900 IN THE NAME OF HUDSON ASSET HOLDING CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4413 IN THE NAME OF HUDSON ASSET HOLDING CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 0353 IN THE NAME OF VIRTUA EDUCATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF JP MORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 4827 IN THE NAME OF VIRTUA EDUCATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTENTS OF TD AMERITRADE ACCOUNT ENDING IN 2857 IN THE NAME OF HEE AH NAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 125 13TH STREET, CRESSKILL, NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?