T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC v. BOROUGH OF WANAQUE et al
Plaintiff: T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC
Defendant: BOROUGH OF WANAQUE PLANNING BOARD and BOROUGH OF WANAQUE
Case Number: 2:2024cv07001
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/2/24. (jbb)
August 1, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(TUNTEVSKI, JOHN)
July 26, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC. BOROUGH OF WANAQUE PLANNING BOARD served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (GAUDIOSO, ROBERT)
July 26, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC. BOROUGH OF WANAQUE served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (GAUDIOSO, ROBERT)
July 24, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF WANAQUE, BOROUGH OF WANAQUE PLANNING BOARD, filed by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC.(KAUFMAN, JONATHAN)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff shall file the First Amended and Supplemental Complaint by 7/31/2024 and serve it accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/24/2024. (sm)
July 23, 2024 Filing 6 Letter from Robert D. Gaudioso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint - Redline)(KAUFMAN, JONATHAN)
June 24, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC. BOROUGH OF WANAQUE PLANNING BOARD served on 6/21/2024, answer due 7/12/2024. (GAUDIOSO, ROBERT)
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC. BOROUGH OF WANAQUE served on 6/21/2024, answer due 7/12/2024. (GAUDIOSO, ROBERT)
June 14, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF WANAQUE, BOROUGH OF WANAQUE PLANNING BOARD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
June 13, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC. (GAUDIOSO, ROBERT)
June 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF WANAQUE, BOROUGH OF WANAQUE PLANNING BOARD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15445579), filed by T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GAUDIOSO, ROBERT)
June 13, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC v. BOROUGH OF WANAQUE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-MOBILE NORTHEAST LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN D KAUFMAN
Represented By: ROBERT D. GAUDIOSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF WANAQUE PLANNING BOARD
Represented By: JOHN M. TUNTEVSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF WANAQUE
Represented By: JOHN M. TUNTEVSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?