AMERICAN REGENT, INC. v. RK PHARMA, INC.
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Defendant: RK PHARMA, INC.
Counter-Defendant: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Counter-Claimant: RK PHARMA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2024cv07805
Filed: July 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER admitting Uma N. Everett, Adam C. LaRock, Christina E. Dashe, Alexander Alfano, and Ryan E. Conkin PHV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/6/2024. (lag, )
September 5, 2024 Filing 21 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Uma N. Everett, Adam C. LaRock, Christina E. Dashe, Alexander Alfano, and Ryan E. Conkin for by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Declaration of Uma N. Everett, #3 Declaration of Adam C. LaRock, #4 Declaration of Christina E. Dashe, #5 Declaration of Alexander Alfano, #6 Declaration of Ryan E. Conkin, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
September 4, 2024 Filing 20 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
September 3, 2024 Pro Hac Vice counsel, YIXIN TANG and BRENT BATZER, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh)
August 30, 2024 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RK PHARMA, INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC) Modified on 9/3/2024 (wh).
August 30, 2024 Filing 18 Defendant RK Pharma, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against AMERICAN REGENT, INC. by RK PHARMA, INC..(ABRAHAM, ERIC) Modified on 9/3/2024 (wh).
August 28, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brent Batzer, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15621057.) (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
August 28, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Yixin Tang, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15620887.) (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
August 22, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by RK PHARMA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/2/2024. (lag, )
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Yixin Tang, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/20/2024. (lag, )
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BRENT BATZER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/20/2024. (lag, )
August 19, 2024 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to time to Answer.. (MURTHA, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Yixin Tang, Esq. by RK PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Eric I. Abraham, Esq., #2 Certification Yixin Tang, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
August 16, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brent Batzer, Esq. by RK PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Eric I. Abraham, Esq., #2 Certification Brent Batzer, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
August 16, 2024 #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brent Batzer, Esq., #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Yixin Tang, Esq. REFERRED to Cathy L. Waldor. (lr, )
August 16, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brent Batzer, Esq., #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Yixin Tang, Esq.. Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIES VARUGHESE on behalf of RK PHARMA, INC. (VARUGHESE, DENNIES)
August 2, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. RK PHARMA, INC. served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
August 1, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE L. BUTLER on behalf of RK PHARMA, INC. (BUTLER, KRISTINE)
August 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MURTHA on behalf of RK PHARMA, INC. (MURTHA, WILLIAM)
August 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC I. ABRAHAM on behalf of RK PHARMA, INC. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
July 24, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RK PHARMA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
July 24, 2024 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lag, )
July 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE A. GADDIS on behalf of AMERICAN REGENT, INC. (GADDIS, CHRISTINE)
July 17, 2024 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
July 16, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
July 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RK PHARMA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15521031) with JURY DEMAND , Related Case Selected, filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN REGENT, INC. v. RK PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Represented By: CHRISTINE A. GADDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: DENNIES VARUGHESE
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Represented By: KRISTINE L. BUTLER
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Represented By: CHRISTINE A. GADDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: RK PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: DENNIES VARUGHESE
Represented By: WILLIAM MURTHA
Represented By: KRISTINE L. BUTLER
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?