YUAN MEI CORPORATION v. SNOW JOE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: YUAN MEI CORPORATION
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10, JOSEPH COHEN, SNOW JOE, LLC, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC and ALL SEASON POWER, LLC
Counter-Defendant: YUAN MEI CORPORATION
Counter-Claimant: SNOW JOE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv07906
Filed: July 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stacey D Adams
Referring Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 9/11/2024. (qa, )
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, JOSEPH COHEN, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (BOREK, JENNIFER)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint Discovery Plan by ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, JOSEPH COHEN, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC.(BOREK, JENNIFER)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. Motion set for 10/7/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by YUAN MEI CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lita Lin, #3 Exhibit 1- 2001 Catalogue, #4 Exhibit 2 - 2003 Catalogue, #5 Exhibit 3 - 2006 Catalogue, #6 Exhibit 4 - 2010 Catalogue, #7 Exhibit 5 -Patent US D802 715 S, #8 Exhibit 6 - Patent US 7422162 B2, #9 Exhibit 7 - Gilmour 2005, #10 Exhibit 8 - Orbit 2004-5, #11 Exhibit 9 - Nelson 2006, #12 Exhibit 10 - Cohen Initial Email, #13 Exhibit 11 - Conf. Agreement 2018, #14 Exhibit 12 - Conf. Agreement 2020, #15 Exhibit 13 - Master Vendor Agreement 2020, #16 Exhibit 14 - June 2022 Shipping Document to Amazon.com Services LLC, #17 Text of Proposed Order, #18 Certificate of Service)(DEFAZIO, JOSEPH)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by YUAN MEI CORPORATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration - Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration - Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration - Commercial Invoice, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration - Commercial Invoice, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration - Business Search, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration - Business Name Search, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration - Business Name Search)(DEFAZIO, JOSEPH)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by SOPHIA N. DAURIA on behalf of YUAN MEI CORPORATION (DAURIA, SOPHIA)
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER denying #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #18 .) The motion is denied without prejudice because it fails to include: (1)the years of admissions into the bars the petitioner is a member in good standing and the names and addresses of the officials or offices maintaining all of the rolls of the members of the bars or, in lieu thereof, certificates of good standing issued by those maintaining such rolls; and (2) whether petitioner has obtained the consent of opposing counsel to the application. Counsel is reminded to review the judicial preferences of Magistrate Judge Adams, which can be found #here. Counsel may refile this application consistent with Local Rule 101.1 and Magistrate Judge Adams' preferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 8/26/2024. (smf)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by YUAN MEI CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph DeFazio, #2 Declaration of Ben L. Wagner, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(DEFAZIO, JOSEPH)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by YUAN MEI CORPORATION. (DEFAZIO, JOSEPH)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk's Text Order - The document #17 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by Plaintiff / Counter Defendant YUAN MEI CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/4/2024. (dam)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #17 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order filed by Joseph Defazio on 8/19/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, please refer to the CM/ECF Event, Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This message is for informational purposes. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Discovery (ECF No. #9 ). The motion is administratively terminated without prejudice. First, it is not "Ex Parte" as it was filed on notice to the Defendants, who objected and pointed out that it was improperly filed. Second, the motion fails to comply with Local Rule 37.1 in the it (i) does not certify that efforts were made to meet and confer with Defendants regarding the issues raised in the motion; and (ii) it was filed without first seeking leave of Court. Third, the motion is unnecessary. A Rule 16 conference is scheduled for September 11, 2024 before Magistrate Judge Adams during which a full discovery schedule shall be discussed and entered. If Plaintiff seeks an expedited discovery schedule, the request will be addressed during the Rule 16 conference. There is no need for a separate motion at this time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 8/14/2024. (smf)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support filed by SNOW JOE, LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (REDISH, GARY)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, JOSEPH COHEN, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law of Defendants All Season Power LLC, Joseph Cohen, and OPE Marketplace LLC in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Certification of Ivette M. Vargas, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants All Season Power LLC, Joseph Cohen, and OPE Marketplace LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(STOLZ, DANIEL)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER: An initial scheduling conference shall be held via video conference on September 11, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found #here. (Initial Conference set for 9/11/2024 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 8/9/2024. (smf)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Motion set for 9/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter from Defendant, Snow Joe LLC re #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery. (REDISH, GARY)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Defendants, All Season Power, LLC, Joseph Cohen, and OPE Marketplace LLC re #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery. (BOREK, JENNIFER)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER BOREK on behalf of ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, JOSEPH COHEN, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC (BOREK, JENNIFER)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Discovery by YUAN MEI CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery, #2 Exhibit A - Order, #3 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DEFAZIO, JOSEPH)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against YUAN MEI CORPORATION by SNOW JOE, LLC.(REDISH, GARY)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YUAN MEI CORPORATION identifying EVERSPRING INVESTMENT CO., LTD as Corporate Parent.. (DEFAZIO, JOSEPH)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH DEFAZIO on behalf of YUAN MEI CORPORATION (DEFAZIO, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JASON COHEN on behalf of SNOW JOE, LLC (COHEN, MICHAEL)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by JOSEPH COHEN, ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/13/2024. (qa, )
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY S. REDISH on behalf of SNOW JOE, LLC (REDISH, GARY)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. (STOLZ, DANIEL)
July 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams added. (ps)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Diversity Disclosure Statement by ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, JOSEPH COHEN, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC. (STOLZ, DANIEL)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOSEPH COHEN, ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-003324-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15531043), filed by JOSEPH COHEN, ALL SEASON POWER, LLC, OPE MARKETPLACE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Original State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Answer of Def. Snow Joe, LLC), #3 Exhibit 3 (Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit 4 (Affidavits of Service), #5 Exhibit 5 (Snow Joe, LLC Answer to Amended Complaint), #6 Exhibit 6 (Consent to Removal of Defendant Snow Joe, LLC), #7 Exhibit 7 (Notice to State Court), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(STOLZ, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YUAN MEI CORPORATION v. SNOW JOE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH COHEN
Represented By: DANIEL M. STOLZ
Represented By: JENNIFER BOREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNOW JOE, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Represented By: GARY S. REDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPE MARKETPLACE LLC
Represented By: DANIEL M. STOLZ
Represented By: JENNIFER BOREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL SEASON POWER, LLC
Represented By: DANIEL M. STOLZ
Represented By: JENNIFER BOREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUAN MEI CORPORATION
Represented By: SOPHIA N. DAURIA
Represented By: JOSEPH DEFAZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: YUAN MEI CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH DEFAZIO
Represented By: JOHN S. MAIRO
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD SKLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: SNOW JOE, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON COHEN
Represented By: GARY S. REDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?