FERNANDEZ v. RIO et al
Plaintiff: OCTAVIO FERNANDEZ
Defendant: LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC., YOANN RIO, ABC CORPS. 11-20 and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv08972
Filed: September 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Re Schedule: Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Disclosures November 6, 2024; E-Discovery conference pursuant to L. Civ. R. 26.1(d) Not applicable.; Service of initial written discovery November 15, 2024; Plaintiff's discovery demands were provided with his Complaint and will be responded to in a timely fashion. *The parties have agreed to utilize Form A and Form C and C (1) InterrogatoriesMaximum number of depositions. Five (5) for each side. Motion to amend or add parties January 24, 2025; Fact discovery deadline June 15, 2025; Plaintiff's expert reports are due July 15, 2025;Defendants' expert reports are due August 15, 2025;Expert Depositions September 15, 2025;Dispositive motions If applicable, briefing schedule to be set by the Court upon completion of discovery. Next conference date See DE 6. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/30/24. (tjg, )
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 2/12/25 at 1pm. Parties are to use the Court's teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/30/24. (tjg, )
October 30, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/30/2024. (tjg, )
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 10/30/24 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/1/24. (tjg, )
October 1, 2024 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
September 30, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MELLIS BAKIR on behalf of LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC., YOANN RIO (BAKIR, MELLIS)
September 26, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC., YOANN RIO.(BAKIR, MELLIS)
September 11, 2024 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defs Yoann Rio and Les Transport A.T.D. Inc.. Attorney ELYSE TORMEY for LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC.,ELYSE TORMEY for YOANN RIO added. (TORMEY, ELYSE)
September 11, 2024 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by YOANN RIO, LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/26/2024. (mj)
September 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC., YOANN RIO from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-4389-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15639764), filed by LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC., YOANN RIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh A, #3 Exhibit Exh B, #4 Exhibit Exh C)(TORMEY, ELYSE)
September 5, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
September 5, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERNANDEZ v. RIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LES TRANSPORT ATD. INC.
Represented By: ELYSE TORMEY
Represented By: MELLIS BAKIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOANN RIO
Represented By: ELYSE TORMEY
Represented By: MELLIS BAKIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCTAVIO FERNANDEZ
Represented By: RAYMOND S. CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?