AYALA et al v. ULRIC et al
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF ALICIA MARTINEZ, DAYSHALEE AYALA and PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: FIDELITY & DEPOSIT CO. OF MARYLAND, QUASHIE ULRIC, JOHN DOE I-III and OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2024cv08987
Filed: September 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 The parties are instructed to dial a new # 1-855-244-8681 and enter Access Code: 23024029552# at the time of the telephone status conference on January 10, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. On or before January 3, 2025, the parties shall file a joint status letter. (nic, )
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/10/2025 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2025. Fact Discovery due by 5/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/31/2024. (ld, )
October 31, 2024 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Video Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2024. (nic, )
October 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN LEE LEITMAN on behalf of PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF ALICIA MARTINEZ (LEITMAN, JONATHAN)
October 28, 2024 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC., QUASHIE ULRIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Hon Allen Re: Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(PAYNE, JEFFREY)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER scheduling an Initial Scheduling Conference for 10/31/2024 at 11:30 AM by way of Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/10/2024. (nic, )
September 6, 2024 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
September 6, 2024 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for NOTICE OF REMOVAL served on AGRAPIDIS & MAROULES, P.C. and Law Offices of Jan Meyer & Associates on 09/06/2024, filed by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC., QUASHIE ULRIC. (PAYNE, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. (PAYNE, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC., QUASHIE ULRIC from Superior Court, Bergen County, case number BER-L-003463-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15642406), filed by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC., QUASHIE ULRIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint of Ayala, #2 Exhibit Answer to Ayala Complaint, #3 Exhibit Complaint of Progressive Garden State Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit Answer to Progressive Complaint, #5 Exhibit Court Order, #6 Exhibit Ayala Demand for Damages $250,000, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(PAYNE, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
September 6, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AYALA et al v. ULRIC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY & DEPOSIT CO. OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUASHIE ULRIC
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY ALAN PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF ALICIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE LEITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYSHALEE AYALA
Represented By: JERRY MAROULES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE GARDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JONATHAN LEE LEITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?