RICE v. UNITED STATE OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: CAROLANNE N. RICE
Defendant: UNITED STATE OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2024cv09088
Filed: September 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364 Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAROLANNE N. RICE. UNITED STATE OF AMERICA served on 9/18/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (MOLINARI, JOHN)
September 30, 2024 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/ Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATE OF AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/2/2024. (and)
September 27, 2024 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (MAHONEY, MARGARET)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET ANN MAHONEY on behalf of All Defendants (MAHONEY, MARGARET)
September 11, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATE OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (and)
September 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15654180) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CAROLANNE N. RICE.(MOLINARI, JOHN)
September 11, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
September 11, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICE v. UNITED STATE OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATE OF AMERICA
Represented By: MARGARET ANN MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLANNE N. RICE
Represented By: JOHN E. MOLINARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?