ABREU et al v. ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARTA ABREU and SANTO ABREU
Defendant: ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC., JUAN A. MENDOZA-DAMA, XYZ CORPS. 1-10 and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv09129
Filed: September 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE and without costs against defendants Daimler Trust. DAIMLER TRUST terminated. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/21/2024. (sm)
October 18, 2024 Filing 6 Defendants, Erives Enterprises, Inc. and Juan A. Mendoza-Dama ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC., JUAN A. MENDOZA-DAMA.(WERNICKE, ADAM)
October 18, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by DAIMLER TRUST. (WERNICKE, ADAM)
September 16, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 -1 Civil Cover Sheet and #2 Diversity Disclosure Statement filed by ADAM WERNICKE on 9/12/2024 were uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your documents have been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh)
September 16, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that #1 -5, Exhibit D - Police Report, submitted by ADAM WERNICKE on 9/12/2024 is not filed pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2 as this attachment contains unredacted personal identifying information. This attachment has been placed under temporary seal by the Clerk's Office. Counsel is advised to review Local Civil Rule 5.2 and comply with the guidelines set therein. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh)
September 12, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (ak, )
September 12, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
September 12, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAIMLER TRUST. (WERNICKE, ADAM)
September 12, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC.. (WERNICKE, ADAM)
September 12, 2024 Filing 2 Diversity Disclosure Statement by DAIMLER TRUST, ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC.. (WERNICKE, ADAM) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/16/2024) (wh, ).
September 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DAIMLER TRUST, ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC. from Passaic County Superior, case number PAS-L-2288-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15658988), filed by DAIMLER TRUST, ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - AOS Daimler, #4 Exhibit C - AOS Erives, #5 Exhibit D - Police Report, #6 Exhibit E - state notice)(WERNICKE, ADAM) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2024) (wh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABREU et al v. ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIVES ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: ADAM M WERNICKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN A. MENDOZA-DAMA
Represented By: ADAM M WERNICKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTA ABREU
Represented By: PAUL A. GARFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTO ABREU
Represented By: PAUL A. GARFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?