WANG v. YODER et al
Plaintiff: SHENG WANG
Defendant: JAMES W. YODER, JOHN DOES 1-10, J YODER TRANSPORT LLC and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv09203
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JARED GLUGETH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GLUGETH, JARED)
October 4, 2024 Filing 6 Diversity Disclosure Statement by J YODER TRANSPORT LLC, JAMES W. YODER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REITER, LORNE)
October 4, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J YODER TRANSPORT LLC, JAMES W. YODER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REITER, LORNE)
September 27, 2024 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHENG WANG. (PIERGUIDI, DAVID)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID JOHN PIERGUIDI on behalf of SHENG WANG (PIERGUIDI, DAVID)
September 17, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sm)
September 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by J YODER TRANSPORTATION LLC, JAMES W. YODER civil cover sheet (REITER, LORNE)
September 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J YODER TRANSPORTATION LLC, JAMES W. YODER from Superior Court, Bergen County, case number BER-L-4745-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15666330), filed by J YODER TRANSPORTATION LLC, JAMES W. YODER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Certificate of Service)(REITER, LORNE)
September 16, 2024 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
September 16, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WANG v. YODER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES W. YODER
Represented By: LORNE M. REITER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J YODER TRANSPORT LLC
Represented By: LORNE M. REITER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHENG WANG
Represented By: JARED GLUGETH
Represented By: DAVID JOHN PIERGUIDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?