INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC v. DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC
Plaintiff: INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC doing business as SHERATON EDISON HOTEL
Case Number: 2:2024cv10044
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Evelyn Padin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2024 Filing 7 Diversity Disclosure Statement by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (SIMON, SHANE)
November 1, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (SIMON, SHANE)
November 1, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2024, answer due 12/24/2024. (GALLAGHER, RYAN)
November 1, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (GALLAGHER, RYAN)
October 25, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
October 25, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jd, )
October 25, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jd, )
October 24, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC d/b/a SHERATON EDISON HOTEL, filed by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hotel Management Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - July 8, 2024 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - August 14, 2024 Correspondence)(SIMON, SHANE)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC d/b/a SHERATON EDISON HOTEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15761770) with JURY DEMAND, filed by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asset Management Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - July 8, 2024 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - August 14, 2024 Correspondence, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIMON, SHANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC v. DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: SHANE P. SIMON
Represented By: RYAN EDWARD GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANGAYACH HOTELS EDISON, LLC doing business as SHERATON EDISON HOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?