UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TIGER ROOFING, INC.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: TIGER ROOFING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2024cv10565
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jamel K Semper
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 651 Occupational Safety/Health
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. TIGER ROOFING, INC. served on 12/27/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. (KIM, JAE)
November 22, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TIGER ROOFING, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TIGER ROOFING, INC., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit)(KIM, JAE)
November 18, 2024 Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TIGER ROOFING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JAE Y. KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIGER ROOFING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?