AMERICAN REGENT, INC. v. RK PHARMA, INC.
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Defendant: RK PHARMA, INC.
Unknown: IN RE SELENIOUS ACID LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2024cv11122
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RK PHARMA, INC. identifying RK Pharma, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ABRAHAM, ERIC)
January 13, 2025 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by RK PHARMA, INC..(ABRAHAM, ERIC)
January 13, 2025 Cases associated: Create association to 2:24-cv-07791-BRM-CLW. (tf, )
January 9, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. RK PHARMA, INC. served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION all parties, through their attorneys, respectfully request that this Court consolidate Civil Action Nos. 24-7791, 24-11108, 24-11109, 24-11112, 24-11114, 24-11116, 24-11118, 24-11122, 24-11124, 24-11138, 24-11126, 24-11130, and 24-11133 and that all papers be filed and maintained in Civil Action No. 24-7791; that all filings in the Consolidated Action shall continue use the following caption going forward: RE SELENIOUS ACID LITIGATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/3/2025. (sm)
January 3, 2025 ***Civil Case Terminated per Order #7 . (sm)
January 2, 2025 Filing 6 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
December 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE A. GADDIS on behalf of AMERICAN REGENT, INC. (GADDIS, CHRISTINE)
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RK PHARMA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mj)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mj)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN REGENT, INC. identifying Daiichi Sankyo, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RK PHARMA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15875976) with JURY DEMAND , Related Case Selected, filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
December 13, 2024 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN REGENT, INC. v. RK PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Represented By: CHRISTINE A. GADDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: IN RE SELENIOUS ACID LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?