UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ASIAN MARKETING, LLC.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ASIAN MARKETING, LLC. doing business as AK MARKET
Case Number: 2:2025cv00591
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Recovery of Debt to US
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. ASIAN MARKETING, LLC. served on 1/29/2025, answer due 2/19/2025. (KIM, JAE)
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASIAN MARKETING, LLC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit)(KIM, JAE)
January 17, 2025 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ASIAN MARKETING, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JAE Y. KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASIAN MARKETING, LLC. doing business as AK MARKET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?