BELL v. NVE BANCORP et al
Plaintiff: JASMINE BELL
Defendant: NVE BANCORP, JOHN DOES and TABLO PTY LTD. doing business as TABLO PUBLSIHING INC.
Case Number: 2:2025cv00618
Filed: January 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2025 Reset Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's. Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
February 18, 2025 Filing 6 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JASMINE BELL re #5 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's (KIM, YONGMOON)
February 10, 2025 Filing 5 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration , First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's ( Responses due by 3/3/2025.) by NVE BANCORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec. J.mahan exs 1,2,3, #2 Brief in sup. of motion to dismiss and compell arb., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KOMINSKY, ADAM)
February 10, 2025 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration, First MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 3/17/2025 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Melissa Connolly, Management Analyst on 01/23/2025. (mls)
January 23, 2025 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NVE BANCORP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/10/2025. (ld)
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant NVE.. (KOMINSKY, ADAM)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 Application for Refund of Fees from Adam Kominsky (finance notified).. (KOMINSKY, ADAM)
January 20, 2025 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
January 19, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NVE BANCORP from NJ SUPERIOR BERGEN, case number BER-L-7321-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15951365), filed by NVE BANCORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLAINT STATE COURT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(KOMINSKY, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. NVE BANCORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASMINE BELL
Represented By: YONGMOON KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVE BANCORP
Represented By: ADAM G. KOMINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TABLO PTY LTD. doing business as TABLO PUBLSIHING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?