NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC v. EDGEWATER GLASS HOUSE LLC et al
Plaintiff: NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC
Defendant: EDGEWATER GLASS HOUSE LLC, I.PARK EDGEWATER II LLC, CORPORATION A-Z and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2025cv00664
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Jamel K Semper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC identifying Nanshan Group Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (RYAN, TIMOTHY)
January 30, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #5 and #6 Summons Returned Executed filed by TIMOTHY RYAN on 1/29/2025 were submitted incorrectly as Affidavits of Service. For future reference, if filing a Return of Service or Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and the Complaint, please refer to the event "Summons Returned Executed" (or "Summons Returned Executed as to USA", when applicable). (wh)
January 29, 2025 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on EDGEWATER GLASS HOUSE LLC on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/18/2025, filed by NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC. (RYAN, TIMOTHY) Modified on 1/30/2025 (wh).
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on I.PARK EDGEWATER II LLC on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/18/2025, filed by NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC. (RYAN, TIMOTHY) Modified on 1/30/2025 (wh).
January 29, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future reference, when filing the Complaint or initiating documents, do not select the all defendants option in CM/ECF. Please select the individual defendants. This message is informational and will remain on the docket. (pm, )
January 23, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY RYAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (RYAN, TIMOTHY)
January 23, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EDGEWATER GLASS HOUSE LLC, I.PARK EDGEWATER II LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pm, )
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC. (FARRELL, SHAWN)
January 23, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (pm, )
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15958946), filed by NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC.(FARRELL, SHAWN)
January 22, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
January 22, 2025 Case assigned to Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC v. EDGEWATER GLASS HOUSE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANSHAN GROUP AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: SHAWN R. FARRELL
Represented By: TIMOTHY RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGEWATER GLASS HOUSE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.PARK EDGEWATER II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORATION A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?