RARITAN BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. CUMIS INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC.
Plaintiff: RARITAN BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Defendant: CUMIS INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01512
Filed: March 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Insurance Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1442 Notice of Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/21/2010. (gxh)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED OPINION. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/22/2009. (gxh)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/22/2009. (gxh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RARITAN BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. CUMIS INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RARITAN BAY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: BRIAN WILLIAM MCALINDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMIS INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC.
Represented By: PHILIP TOUITOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?