RARITAN BAYKEEPER, INC. et al v. NL INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RARITAN BAYKEEPER, INC. and EDISON WETLANDS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Defendant: NL INDUSTRIES, INC., NL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., SAYREVILLE ECONOMIC AND REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY, O'NEILL PROPERTIES GROUP, L.P., SAYREVILLE SEAPORT ASSOCIATES, L.P., COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX, STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STEPHEN DILTS, BERNARD JAMES, NEW JERSEY TURNPIKE AUTHORITY and DIANE GUTIERREZ-SCACCETTI
Case Number: 3:2009cv04117
Filed: August 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Joel A. Pisano
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 526 is DENIED; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 529 is DENIED; Defendants' Motions to Preclude Testimony 527 and 528 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/26/2019. (jem)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/20/2018. (mps)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/29/2018. (mps)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/16/2017. (mps)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/26/2017. (gxh)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/19/2016. (mps)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/31/2015. (eaj)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 300 Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate; denying 308 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File opposition to NJTAs Brief in Support of Defendants Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/30/2014. (eaj)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying 293 Raritan's Motion to Compel; granting NL's 294 Cross-Motion for Protective Order; Ordering that the Court STRIKES Raritan's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel 298 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/30/2014. (eaj)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 LETTER OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/2/2014. (eaj)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 1/8/2013. (eaj)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 5/26/10. (lk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RARITAN BAYKEEPER, INC. et al v. NL INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RARITAN BAYKEEPER, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDISON WETLANDS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: EDWARD LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAYREVILLE ECONOMIC AND REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'NEILL PROPERTIES GROUP, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAYREVILLE SEAPORT ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN DILTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY TURNPIKE AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE GUTIERREZ-SCACCETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?