PARTS GEEK, LLC v. U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: PARTS GEEK, LLC
Defendant: U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC. and GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 3:2009cv05578
Filed: November 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Mary L. Cooper
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Case has been opened in California Northern Districtas case 5:10-cv-01713, filed 04/22/2010. (dd, )
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Case sent via e-mail to InterdistrictTransfer_CAND@cand.uscourts.gov... Extraction Completed. (dd, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (ss, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Transfer Case to USDC for the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (USCA Electronically Notified) ; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 4/1/2010. (ss, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2010: # 1 Clerk's Letter) (ss, ).
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 4/1/2010. (ss, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC.. (KRAUSS, KURT)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 BRIEF in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PARTS GEEK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(ANGSTREICH, STEVEN)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by GOOGLE, INC. re 20 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(HANGLEY, MICHELE)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ozan Varol to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (STEINBERG, DYLAN)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Silbert to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (STEINBERG, DYLAN)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Kwun to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (STEINBERG, DYLAN)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received for MICHAEL KWUN, DAVID S. SILBERT and OZAN O. VARLO, ESQS: $ 450, receipt number 3200 360001 (mmh)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HANGLEY, MICHELE)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and admitting MICHAEL KWUN, DAVID S. SILBERT and OZAN O. VARLO, ESQS. pro hac vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/3/2010. (ss, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by PARTS GEEK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(ANGSTREICH, STEVEN)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DYLAN JOSHUA STEINBERG on behalf of GOOGLE, INC. (STEINBERG, DYLAN)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 3/1/2010 before Judge Cooper will be decided on the papers. No appearance required unless notified by the Court. (mmh)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC.. Responses due by 2/16/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Certification, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(KRAUSS, KURT)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. Motion set for 2/16/2010 before Judge Mary L. Cooper. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gxh)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOOGLE, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (HANGLEY, MICHELE)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Certification)(HANGLEY, MICHELE)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael S. Kwun, 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ozan O. Varol, 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Silbert. Motion set for 2/16/2010 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (ss, )
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ozan O. Varol by GOOGLE, INC.. (HANGLEY, MICHELE)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Silbert by GOOGLE, INC.. (HANGLEY, MICHELE)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael S. Kwun by GOOGLE, INC.. (HANGLEY, MICHELE)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. O'SHAUGHNESSY on behalf of U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC. (O'SHAUGHNESSY, WILLIAM)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document # 8 submitted by K. Kraus on 1/5/2010 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/26/2010. (ss, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PARTS GEEK, LLC. U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC. served on 12/22/2009, answer due 1/11/2010. (ANGSTREICH, STEVEN)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KRAUSS, KURT)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KURT WHITNEY KRAUSS on behalf of U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Application for Extension, # 2 Certificate of Service)(KRAUSS, KURT)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendant Google, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; time extended to 2/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/23/2009. (mmh)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Sharon D. Syphrett* (ss, )
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by PARTS GEEK, LLC as to U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC.. (ANGSTREICH, STEVEN)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GOOGLE, INC.. GOOGLE, INC. waiver sent on 11/4/2009, answer due 1/3/2010. (ANGSTREICH, STEVEN)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eaj)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARTS GEEK, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (eaj)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC., GOOGLE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 2792568.) JURY DEMANDED. No Summons Attached. Filed by PARTS GEEK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(eaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARTS GEEK, LLC v. U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARTS GEEK, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN E. ANGSTREICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. AUTO PARTS NETWORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?