MYLAN INC. et al v. SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MYLAN INC. and MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM P.L.C., SB PHARMCO PUERTO RICO, INC., APOTEX INC. and APOTEX CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2010cv04809
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Presiding Judge: Joel A. Pisano
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 CLERK'S OPINION Granting in Part and Denying in Part re 413 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiffs MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., and MYLAN INC. (William T. Walsh, Clerk) (jo, )
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 407 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 7/16/2014. (eaj)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 2/23/2012. (eaj)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 10/20/2010. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MYLAN INC. et al v. SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: PETER J. CRESCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: PETER J. CRESCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB PHARMCO PUERTO RICO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?