U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-LDP1 v. COBALT REALTY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-LDP1
Defendant: COBALT REALTY, LLC and STEVE KOGUT
Case Number: 3:2010cv05093
Filed: October 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Mary L. Cooper
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ADOPTING 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 75 Motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 4/16/2013. (gxh)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/22/2013. (gxh)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 4/5/2011. (gxh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-LDP1 v. COBALT REALTY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of J.P. Morgan Chase Commercial Mortgage Securities Corp., Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-LDP1
Represented By: MARK SIGMUND LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COBALT REALTY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE KOGUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?