CHAVARRIAGA v. LANIGAN

Petitioner: ALEXANDRA CHAVARRIAGA
Respondent: GARY M. LANIGAN
Case Number: 3:2012cv07700
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Hunterdon
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/19/2017. (mps)
July 27, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER that within 21 days from the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall supplement his Answer with additional briefing on the merger issue as directed above; further Ordering that Petitioner shall have 14 days after the filing of Respondent's supplemental briefing to file a reply. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/23/2015. (eaj)
July 2, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall supplement his Answer by adhering to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Habeas Rules in providing the relevant state court record of proceedings; ORDERED that, within seven (7) days from the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall update the Court regarding Petitioner's current custody status. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/1/2015. (kas, )
May 4, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER that within 7 days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall show cause why the Court should not find Respondent in contempt for failure to comply with the Court's 5/30/2014 Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/4/2015. (eaj)
March 15, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/15/2013. (eaj)
January 24, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/24/2013. (eaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAVARRIAGA v. LANIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALEXANDRA CHAVARRIAGA
Represented By: FREDRIC J. GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GARY M. LANIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?