ROH v. SAWANT et al
Plaintiff: SAMUEL ROH
Defendant: SUNEEL SAWANT, ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL CORP., ATI HOLDING and KUSHVINDER MANGAT
Case Number: 3:2013cv02251
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 82 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/16/2017. (mmh)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Default Judgment as to all Defendants. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/29/2016. (km)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING 33 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a renewed motion for default judgment as to the Defendant Companies at the conclusion of the case against Sawant, the appearing party. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/5/2014. (kas, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROH v. SAWANT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL ROH
Represented By: BONG JUNE KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNEEL SAWANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATI HOLDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUSHVINDER MANGAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?