SKLAR v. AMARIN CORPORATION PLC et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN SKLAR
Defendant: AMARIN CORPORATION PLC and JOSEPH S. ZAKRZEWSKI
Case Number: 3:2013cv06663
Filed: November 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/26/2016. (km)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/26/2015. (kas, )
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2014. (gxh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKLAR v. AMARIN CORPORATION PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN SKLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY W. HERRMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMARIN CORPORATION PLC
Represented By: ALLISON M. WUERTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH S. ZAKRZEWSKI
Represented By: ALLISON M. WUERTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?