MARRIN v. CAPITAL HEALTH et al
Plaintiff: JANICE MARRIN
Defendant: CAPITAL HEALTH, CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CAPITAL HEALTH - HOPEWELL, JOAN DUVALL and CAROLANN BASS
Case Number: 3:2014cv02558
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/29/2019. (km)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/20/2017. (km)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/31/2017. (km)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/29/2015. (eaj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARRIN v. CAPITAL HEALTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE MARRIN
Represented By: MICHAEL SCOTT HARWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL HEALTH
Represented By: KELLY D. BUNTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: KELLY D. BUNTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL HEALTH - HOPEWELL
Represented By: KELLY D. BUNTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN DUVALL
Represented By: KELLY D. BUNTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLANN BASS
Represented By: KELLY D. BUNTING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?