UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 8 DRIFT STREET, NEW BRUNSWICK, NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 8 DRIFT STREET, NEW BRUNSWICK, NEW JERSEY, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 17 NORTON ROAD, EAST BRUNSWICK, NEW JERSEY, ALL RIGHT, TITLE, AND INTEREST IN ANY AND ALL SHARES OF CAPITAL STOCK OF 137 45th AVENUE TENANTS CORP. HELD IN THE NAME OF GENGMIN QIU AND IN THE PROPRIETARY LEASE FOR UNIT 6H, 137-77 45TH AVENUE, FLU, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 1405 SOUTH OCEAN BOULEVARD, MYRTLE BEACH, SOUTH CAROLINA, $4,590.25 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED FROM CATHAY BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 665931796, HELD IN THE NAME OF 52 BD, INC., $48,854.89 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED FROM CATHAY BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 675981237, HELD IN THE NAME OF GENGWU QIU and $362,186.67 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED FROM CATHAY BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 665934436, HELD IN THE NAME OF GENGWU QIU
Case Number: 3:2014cv03587
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1355 Petition for Return of Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Claimants' motion for a pretrial order 99 is DENIED; the Government's cross-motion for summary judgment 107 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/20/2020. (jem)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/20/2015. (eaj)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 28 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/20/2015. (eaj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 8 DRIFT STREET, NEW BRUNSWICK, NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MARION PERCELL(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 8 DRIFT STREET, NEW BRUNSWICK, NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 17 NORTON ROAD, EAST BRUNSWICK, NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL RIGHT, TITLE, AND INTEREST IN ANY AND ALL SHARES OF CAPITAL STOCK OF 137 45th AVENUE TENANTS CORP. HELD IN THE NAME OF GENGMIN QIU AND IN THE PROPRIETARY LEASE FOR UNIT 6H, 137-77 45TH AVENUE, FLU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 1405 SOUTH OCEAN BOULEVARD, MYRTLE BEACH, SOUTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,590.25 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED FROM CATHAY BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 665931796, HELD IN THE NAME OF 52 BD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $48,854.89 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED FROM CATHAY BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 675981237, HELD IN THE NAME OF GENGWU QIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $362,186.67 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED FROM CATHAY BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 665934436, HELD IN THE NAME OF GENGWU QIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?