GAINES v. D'ILIO et al
Petitioner: HERMAN GAINES
Respondent: STEPHEN D'ILIO and NEW JERSEY STATE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 3:2014cv04966
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner's 18 MOTION to Add Certain Docket Entries is granted. The Clerk shall file ECF Nos. 14 and 15 of Case No. 14-4966 in Case No. 15-761. The Clerk shall Close Case No. 14-4966. The Clerk shall serve this Order on Petitioner by regular mail. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/20/2017. (mps)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Grounds I and VI of the Petition are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; that Respondents shall file a response to the Petition within 45 days. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/9/2016. (mmh)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM and ORDER that the Clerk shall administratively terminate this case; directing the Clerk to supply Petitioner with certain forms; that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court in writing within 30 days. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/18/2014. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAINES v. D'ILIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HERMAN GAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEPHEN D'ILIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NEW JERSEY STATE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?