LAOYE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: AKINTOYE LAOYE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2014cv05195
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 02/13/2020. (jmh)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiffs must file a revised, joint in forma pauperis application by 10/20/2017. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/5/2017. (mps)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Plaintiff's ex parte TRO application (d.e. 18 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/14/2017. (mmh)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's ex parte TRO application (d.e. 15 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/24/2017. (mmh)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/1/2016. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAOYE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKINTOYE LAOYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?