GANNONE v. D'ILIO et al
Petitioner: FRANCIS R. GANNONE, JR.
Respondent: STEPHEN D'ILIO and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 3:2014cv06026
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/13/2018. (mmh)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petitioner shall, within 45 days of the entry of this Order, show cause in writing as to why the Petition should not be denied as time-barred. Respondent shall have 14 days after receipt of Petitioner's submission to respond. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/18/2017. (mmh)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM and ORDER that the Clerk shall administratively terminate this case and supply Petitioner with a blank form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in a Habeas Corpus Case; that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this action he shall so notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/3/2014. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GANNONE v. D'ILIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANCIS R. GANNONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEPHEN D'ILIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?