KADONSKY v. AHSAN, ET AL.
Plaintiff: STEVEN KADONSKY
Defendant: ABU AHSAN, DONIQUE IVERY, NURSE LANCE, PAULA AZARA, SID OFF. K. KOCH, SID OFF. WISE, V. WOJCIECHOWICZ, JOSEPH MITCHELLI, ESTHER BAKONYI, CHARLES WARREN, KENITH NELSON, UNIVERSITY CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, UNIVERSITY OF MEDICINE & DENTISTRY OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30, LISA JANTZ, SHIRLEY DICKSTEIN, GEORGE ROBINSON, STEPHEN D'ILIO, D. GERDES, JAMES FARLEY, D. SMITH and ANTONIO CAMPOS
Case Number: 3:2014cv07248
Filed: November 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/19/2018. (mps)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/28/2018. (mps)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' 47 Motion to Dismiss is Dismissed without prejudice. Defendants may refile the motion within ten (10) days of this Order. The Clerk shall serve this Order upon Plaintiff by regular mail. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/9/2017. (mps)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that all federal claims against Defendants CHARLES WARREN, STEPHEN D'ILIO, and KENITH NELSON in the Fourth Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. NJDOC is reinstated as a defendant in this case. All federal clai ms against Defendant NJDOC in the Fourth Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims in the Fourth Amended Complaint, including the state law claims, are permitted to proceed. Defendant shall file and serve an answer within fourteen days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/19/2017. (mps)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Denying Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 24 ; Ordering the Clerk to send another Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/4/2015. (eaj) Modified on 8/4/2015 (eaj, ).
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying the Application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 in all 3 actions; Administratively terminating Case Nos 14-8104 and 14-8105; If Plaintiff wished to reopen 14-4801 and 14-8105, he shall notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order; Plaintiff's writing should include either (1) a complete, signed in forma pauperis application and a certified 6 month prison account statement or the $400 fee. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/25/2015. (eaj) Modified on 6/25/2015 (eaj, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KADONSKY v. AHSAN, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN KADONSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABU AHSAN
Represented By: MICHAEL JOHN LUNGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONIQUE IVERY
Represented By: MICHAEL JOHN LUNGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE LANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA AZARA
Represented By: MICHAEL JOHN LUNGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SID OFF. K. KOCH
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SID OFF. WISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. WOJCIECHOWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH MITCHELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTHER BAKONYI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENITH NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE
Represented By: MICHAEL JOHN LUNGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF MEDICINE & DENTISTRY OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: MICHAEL JOHN LUNGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA JANTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY DICKSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ROBINSON
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN D'ILIO
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. GERDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES FARLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. SMITH
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CAMPOS
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?