HOLLEY v. PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: AMANDA HOLLEY
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY, PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY POLICE DEPARTMENT, SUPERINTENDENT MICHAEL A. FEDORKO, CHIEF MICHAEL BROWN, SERGEANT ERICK TORRES and JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2014cv07534
Filed: December 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Ocean
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Holley's Motion for Reconsideration (d.e 168 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/15/2018. (mmh)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the parties utilize these standards in constructing their jury charges and instructions and submit a joint proposal by Monday, October 15, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/12/2018. (mmh)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/15/2017. (mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLEY v. PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA HOLLEY
Represented By: GINA MENDOLA LONGARZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT MICHAEL A. FEDORKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF MICHAEL BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT ERICK TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?