CAVANAUGH v. NADROWSKI
Petitioner: TRAVIS ANDREW CAVANAUGH
Respondent: BARRY NADROWSKI
Case Number: 3:2015cv03537
Filed: May 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner's letters, construed as motions of reconsideration, 19 and 24 , are denied. Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis for the purposes of appeal, 21 , is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall serve this Order upon Petitioner by regular mail, and shall Close the file. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/13/2017. (mps)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that a certificate of appealability for the Court's 12/21/2016 denial of the Petition is denied. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/17/2017. (mps)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/21/2016. (mps)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case for Petitioner's failure to either pay the requisite filing fee of $5.00 or submit a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERED that, if Petitioner wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order, in writing addressed to the Clerk of the Court, Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S. Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Room 2020, Trenton, New Jersey 08608. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/29/2015. (kas, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAVANAUGH v. NADROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRAVIS ANDREW CAVANAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BARRY NADROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?