EBERT et al v. TOWNSHIP OF HAMILTON et al
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE B. EBERT and REBECCA A. VARES-EBERT
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF HAMILTON, KELLY A. YAEDE, JOHN DOE I and JOHN DOE II
Case Number: 3:2015cv07331
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 02/27/2020. (jdb)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/05/2019. (jdb)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/12/2018. (mmh)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/9/2018. (km)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 75 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion; Plaintiffs' requested alternative relief pursuant to Rule 7.l(d)(5) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/18/2018. (km)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/15/2017. (mps)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 53 MOTION to Modify 48 Letter Order. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/11/2017. (km)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM and ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 47 Motion for Clarification and 49 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/4/2017. (km)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/9/2017. (km)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 1/27/2017. (km)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/15/2016. (km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EBERT et al v. TOWNSHIP OF HAMILTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE B. EBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA A. VARES-EBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY A. YAEDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?