HASHEM v. HUNTERDON COUNTY et al

Plaintiff: SIREEN HASHEM
Defendant: HUNTERDON COUNTY, HUNTERDON CENTRAL REGIONAL BOARD OF EDUCATION, HUNTERDON CENTRAL REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL, CHRISTINA STEFFNER, SUZANNE COOLEY, ROBERT ZYWICKI and REBECCA LUCAS
Case Number: 3:2015cv08585
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Hunterdon
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/30/2019. (mmh)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for judicial relief; denying 78 Motion to Compel. No later than 30 days from the date of this Order Defendants are directed to produce unredacted versions of documents previously produced th at relate to (1) complaints made by students and/or parents about Plaintiff; and (2) "witness statements" or incident reports in which the names students and/or parents appear; the unredacted names may be designated Attorneys Eyes Only pursuant to the Discovery Confidentiality Order and counsel are directed to submit a joint status report to the COurt no later than 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/23/2018. (mmh)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 40 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/18/2017. (mmh)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/2/2017. (mmh)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/29/2016. (mmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HASHEM v. HUNTERDON COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIREEN HASHEM
Represented By: TARIQ HUSSAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTERDON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTERDON CENTRAL REGIONAL BOARD OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTERDON CENTRAL REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA STEFFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT ZYWICKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?