ENOBAKHARE et al v. ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL et al
Plaintiff: HELEN ENOBAKHARE and WILLIAM ENOBAKHARE
Defendant: ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, JOHN DOES 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATION, THE YELLOW CAB COMPANY and ADAM TYUS
Case Number: 3:2016cv01457
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 54 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk's entry of default against Defendant Adam Tyus, dated 8/25/2016 is VACATED. If Plaintiffs want to proceed in this action, they must effect proper service of process on Defendant Tyus by 12/8/2017. Plaintiffs must provide the Court with a status update by 12/13/2017. If Plaintiffs fail to properly serve Defendant Tyus by 12/8/2017 or update the Court by 12/13/2017, the Court will dismiss this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/6/2017. (mps)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motions to Vacate Order of Dismissal and to Restore (ECF 28 and 30 ) are dismissed as moot. Defendant Robert Wood Johnson University Hospital's 36 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Robert Wood Johnson University Hospital are dismissed, but Plaintiffs' claims against the remaining defendants contained in the Amended Complaint remain. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 5/23/2017. (mps)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/1/2017. (mps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENOBAKHARE et al v. ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN ENOBAKHARE
Represented By: ANTOINETTE M. WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM ENOBAKHARE
Represented By: ANTOINETTE M. WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE YELLOW CAB COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM TYUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?