JULY v. D'ILIO et al
Plaintiff: SHAWN JULY
Defendant: STEPHEN D'ILIO, ANTONIO CAMPOS, J. HINTZ, D. SMITH, CHARLES E. WARREN, JR., JIM BARNES, KENNETH NELSON, GARY M. LANIGAN, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON, UNKNOWN EMPLOYEES AND/OR AGENTS OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS 1-99 (HEREINAFTER "UEA-NJDOC 1-99"), UNKNOWN EMPLOYEES AND/OR AGENTS OF THE NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON 1-99 (HEREINAFTER "UEA-NJSP 1-99") and JONN DOES 1-99
Case Number: 3:2016cv04568
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/06/2020. (jem)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall reopen the case by making a new and separate docket entry reading "Civil Case Reopened." Plaintiff's 25 motion to submit a supplemental complaint is granted. Within 30 days, Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint. The Clerk shall serve this Order upon Plaintiff by regular mail. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/3/2018. (mps)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/21/2017. (mps)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; Administratively terminating this case; Ordering the Clerk to send Plaintiff a blank IFP application; Ordering if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notif y the Court, in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order; Plaintiffs writing shall include either a complete, signed in forma pauperis application, including a proper certified six-month prison account statement or the $400 filing fee. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/6/2016. (eaj)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/22/2016. (eaj)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis; Administratively terminating this action; further Ordering that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court, inwriting, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order; Plaintiffs writing shall include either (1) a complete, signed in forma pauperis application, including a proper certified six-month prison account statement, or (2) the $400 fee. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/16/2016. (eaj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JULY v. D'ILIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN JULY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN D'ILIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CAMPOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. HINTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES E. WARREN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY M. LANIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN EMPLOYEES AND/OR AGENTS OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS 1-99 (HEREINAFTER "UEA-NJDOC 1-99")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN EMPLOYEES AND/OR AGENTS OF THE NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON 1-99 (HEREINAFTER "UEA-NJSP 1-99")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONN DOES 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?