MOLESKI v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: DAVID MOLESKI
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2016cv08511
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/4/2019. (km)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/1/2018. (km)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 10 Motion for the Judge in this Case to Certify that She is Acting Independently and is Following 28 USC Sections 453, 454, 455 and all Codes of Judicial Conduct ; denying 11 Motion for an Emergency Objection to Ord er on 2255 Motion and Demand for Immediate Release ; denying 14 Motion: Extraordinary Writ Pursuant to the Original Writ of Habeas Corpus in the Constitution and 28 USC Section 1651, The All Writs Act ; and denying 18 Emergency Motion for Reconsideration for Bail Reconsideration; Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to the Motion and supporting memorandum within 45 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/10/2017. (km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOLESKI v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID MOLESKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: YAEL T. EPSTEIN
Represented By: TINO MARTIN LISELLA
Represented By: FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?