KENNY v. DENBO et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT KENNY
Defendant: SUSAN M. DENBO, RIDER UNIVERSITY and THE RIDER UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS
Case Number: 3:2016cv08578
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/19/2017. (km)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/13/2017. (mps)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 5/15/2017. (mps)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 1/24/2017. (mps)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 1/5/2017. (mps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNY v. DENBO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN M. DENBO
Represented By: MARY PAT GALLAGHER
Represented By: STEVEN GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDER UNIVERSITY
Represented By: MARY PAT GALLAGHER
Represented By: STEVEN GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE RIDER UNIVERSITY CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS
Represented By: MATTHEW D. AREMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?