STEVENS v. JONES et al
Plaintiff: CALVIN TAYLOR STEVENS
Defendant: ANTHONY JONES and THE NEW BRUNSWICK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 3:2016cv08694
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Brian R. Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 07/31/2019. (jmh)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/29/2018. (mmh)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this matter; within 30 days of Plaintiff's arrival at his final prison destination, and receipt of his necessary legal and mailing materials, Plaintiff shall submit a letter to this Court requesting to re-open this matter. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/5/2018. (mmh)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM ORDERED that Plaintiff's malicious prosecution claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Defendants; Plaintiff's claim that defendants Vitale and Greggus conspired with defendant Jones to falsely arrest and imprison him is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff's false arrest and false imprisonment claims shall continue to PROCEED against defendant Jones only. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/2/2017. (km, )
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 6/8/2017. (seb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEVENS v. JONES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN TAYLOR STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW BRUNSWICK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?