PLONKA v. H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT INC.
Plaintiff: ANDREAS PLONKA
Defendant: H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT INC.
Case Number: 3:2016cv09539
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Presiding Judge: Lois H. Goodman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 10/4/2017. (mps)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/9/2017. (mps)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen case he shall notify the Court within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order; Plaintiff's writing shall include either (1) a complete, signed in forma pauperis application or (2) the necessary filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action.. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/2/2017. (mps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLONKA v. H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREAS PLONKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?